MD HB1460 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $150,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Mayor and Town Council of the Town of North Brentwood for specified development or improvement purposes related to the redevelopment of the buildings at 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Redevelopment of 4510 41st Avenue and 4516 41st Avenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |