MD HB146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration, when processing an application for a duplicate license of a victim of a robbery or theft whose license is taken during the robbery or theft, to issue the duplicate license free of charge if the victim of the robbery or burglary whose license is taken presents a police report of the incident when applying for a duplicate license.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {560514/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Robbery
Theft
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Victims
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Reports
Robbery
Theft
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Victims