MD HB145 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owner of a nursing home or other appropriate nursing home authority, under specified circumstances, to immediately appoint a nonlicensed person to serve in the capacity of interim nursing home administrator; authorizing the appointed nonlicensed person to act as the interim nursing home administrator on filing an application with the State Board of Nursing Home Administrators requesting a provisional license; etc.
Title
Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |