MD HB1447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB224
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2020.
Title
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1447 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1045 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1045 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Information Technology, Department of
Language
Licenses
Notices
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Information Technology, Department of
Language
Licenses
Notices
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials