MD HB1444 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the incorporation of the Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City; altering the purpose of the Association; stating the principal address of and the name and address of the resident agent of the Association; prohibiting the Association from issuing capital stock; providing that the business and affairs of the Association is managed by the Board of Trustees; providing for the Board of Trustees; etc.
Title
Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | House | Reassigned to Economic Matters |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Associations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Education
Ethics
Federal Government
Liability
Monuments and Memorials
Nonprofit Organizations
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
Education
Ethics
Federal Government
Liability
Monuments and Memorials
Nonprofit Organizations
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students