MD HB1442 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend to December 1, 2012 the deadline for the Board of Trustees of HopeWell Cancer Support, Inc. to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided for the HopeWell Cancer Support Facility, located in Lutherville; requiring the Board of Public Works to expend or encumber the proceeds of the loan by December 1, 2012; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore County - HopeWell
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-08 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1442.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1442f.pdf |