MD HB1439 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to issue a permit for a pharmacy to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy; providing that a person that holds a permit to practice as a specialty practice pharmacy and that does not hold a pharmacy permit is only authorized to establish or operate a certain pharmacy; requiring that a separate pharmacy permit to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy is required for each pharmacy that a person establishes or operates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations12101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12401(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12402(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12403(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12403.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12407(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations12409(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback