MD HB1439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to issue a permit for a pharmacy to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy; providing that a person that holds a permit to practice as a specialty practice pharmacy and that does not hold a pharmacy permit is only authorized to establish or operate a certain pharmacy; requiring that a separate pharmacy permit to operate as a specialty practice pharmacy is required for each pharmacy that a person establishes or operates; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Specialty Practice Pharmacy - Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Corporations
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Corporations
Drugs
Fees
Health Occupations
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 403.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |