MD HB1439 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $17,620,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Calvert County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Income Tax
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Securities
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Income Tax
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Officials
Revenue and Taxes
Securities