MD HB1439 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $50,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Edgewood Community Support Center, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Edgewood Community Support Center Facility, located in Harford County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Edgewood Community Support Center Facility Completion
Sponsors
Sen. Mary James [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Harford County
Municipal Corporations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Harford County
Municipal Corporations
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)