MD HB1432 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation and the Maryland Transit Administration to study the feasibility of using the navigable waters of the Chesapeake Bay as a water transportation network to link waterfront communities along the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Department and the Administration to prepare an inventory of certain facilities on the Chesapeake Bay and to estimate the cost of implementing a certain network; requiring a certain report be made to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation8102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback