MD HB1425 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit in the Governor's Grants Office for the purpose of tracking federal infrastructure grants and assisting State agencies in the award of the grants under the federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act of 2021.
Title
Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB755 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
internet
Investments
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Communications
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
internet
Investments
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |