MD HB142 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period during which the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must examine the business of specified mortgage lender licensees from at least once during any 36-month period to at least once during any 60-month period; and altering the minimum time period for which licensed mortgage lenders must retain specified records from 25 to 61 months.
Title
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Examinations
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Records
Rules and Regulations
Time
Finance Companies
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Records
Rules and Regulations
Time