MD HB1413 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution prohibiting the General Assembly from enacting specified omnibus bills; requiring the Governor to submit to the General Assembly a separate bill for each item in the Budget that requires an action of the General Assembly in addition to the Budget Bill; requiring the General Assembly to pass a separate bill for each item in the Budget that requires an action of the General Assembly in addition to the Budget Bill; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Title
Operating Budget - Budget Reconciliation - Requirement for Separate Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-02-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1413.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1413f.pdf |