MD HB141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act; altering the persons to whom and circumstances under which the Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation is required to provide certain coverage; providing that the Act does not provide coverage to persons who acquire the right to receive certain payments; altering the policies and contracts issued by member insurers that may not be provided coverage under the Act; providing that certain provisions of State insurance law apply to health maintenance organizations; etc.
Title
Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Corporation Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 73 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {676284/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB186 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 74
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Certifications
Claims
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Courts
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Licenses
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Certifications
Claims
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Courts
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Licenses
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 407.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 9 | 414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |