MD HB1404 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a political subdivision to enact a certain local law or ordinance regarding the storage of dissolved air flotation by-products that is equal to or more stringent than the permit requirements for a sewage sludge utilization permit.
Title
Environment – Storage of Dissolved Air Flotation By–Products – Local Authority
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Michael Griffith [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1149 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Agriculture
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
permits
Public Local Laws
Sewage
Storage
Wastewater
Counties
Environment
Environmental Matters
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
permits
Public Local Laws
Sewage
Storage
Wastewater
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 731 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 732 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |