MD HB140 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to study the effectiveness of specified programs for offenders; authorizing the study to contain specified information; providing that, if a study is conducted, the intent of the General Assembly is that the Department report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2013, and every 3 years thereafter, regarding the effectiveness of departmental programs for offenders; etc.
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Study and Reports on
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 382311/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-23 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-23 | First Reading Judiciary |