MD HB14 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including income from an individual retirement account or a certain annuity within a certain subtraction modification for certain retirement income if contributions to the individual retirement account or annuity consist entirely of the tax-free rollover of distributions from an employee retirement system; repealing a certain obsolete provision relating to a certain retirement plan; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-11-19 | House | Pre-filed |