MD HB139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the process and timeframe for exercising specified appeal rights related to employer determinations under the unemployment insurance law; requiring the Lower Appeals Division to hear and decide appeals from review determination decisions; authorizing an employer to file an appeal of a specified review determination decision to the Lower Appeals Division and the Board of Appeals under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appeals
Court of Appeals
Electronic Communication
Hearings
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Postal Service
Rules and Regulations
Time
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment
Court of Appeals
Electronic Communication
Hearings
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Postal Service
Rules and Regulations
Time
Unemployment Insurance
Work, Labor and Employment