MD HB139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law making Sunday sales by holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses in Garrett County contingent on the consumer placing an order for a meal at a specified time or the consumer being otherwise entitled to a meal on the premises as part of a prearranged event; making a technical change; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673392/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Food
Garrett County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Food
Garrett County