MD HB1378 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust for private sector employees; establishing the Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Board to implement, maintain, and administer the Program and the Trust; requiring the Board to take any action to ensure that the Program is not preempted by federal law, to establish procedures and disclosures to protect the interests of participants and employers, and to disseminate to employers and employees information about the Program prior to enrollment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-41) (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-45) (Y: 92 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {793025/1 Rejected (51-84) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-29 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (O'Donnell) {203923/1 Rejected (56-81) (Y: 56 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (97-41)
2016-04-11HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {819531/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-04-08SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2016-04-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2016-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (92-45)
2016-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {793025/1 Rejected (51-84)
2016-04-05HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {203923/1 Rejected (56-81)
2016-04-04HouseSpecial Order until 4/5 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {433025/1 Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {273598/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2016-03-15HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1378&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1378f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1378t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1378e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_324_hb1378e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1378_27359801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1378_43302501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1378_20392301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1378_79302501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1378_81953101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1378.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1378_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1378_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1378,h-0993&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1378,h-0994&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1378,h-1026&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1378,s-1282&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1378,h-1374&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback