MD HB1376 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified air ambulance transport services; requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that use a provider panel to ensure that provider panels include specified providers for a specified purpose; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] |
Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-29 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Emergency Medical Services
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Transportation
Emergency Medical Services
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Motor Vehicles
Nonprofit Organizations
Transportation