MD HB1376 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $50,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Thomas Johnson High School Patriots Boosters, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium, including installing a turf field, located in Frederick County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; establishing a deadline for the encumbrance or expenditure of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |