MD HB1374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; altering certain matching fund and expenditure requirements; repealing certain provisions that require grantees to provide and expend a certain matching fund; etc.
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {813827/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Camps
Capital Budgets
Cecil County
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Elderly Persons
Fire Protection
Food
Frederick County
Garrett County
Grants
Hagerstown
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Howard County
Libraries
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Monuments and Memorials
Museums
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
St. Mary's County
State Bonds
Sunset
Veterans
Washington County
Youth
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Camps
Capital Budgets
Cecil County
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Elderly Persons
Fire Protection
Food
Frederick County
Garrett County
Grants
Hagerstown
Historical Matters
Hospitals
Howard County
Libraries
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Monuments and Memorials
Museums
Parking
Prince George's County
Prior Authorizations
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
St. Mary's County
State Bonds
Sunset
Veterans
Washington County
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |