MD HB1372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-30 - Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to educate consumers about customer service choice in accordance with a provision of law; requiring the Commission to host a section on its website related to customer choice; requiring the website to comply with specified standards and to include specified information; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Customer Education on Customer Choice
Sponsors
Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. Sue Hecht [D] |
Del. Carolyn Krysiak [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-18 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
News Media
Notices
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Consumer Protection
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
News Media
Notices
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Utilities