MD HB137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Procurement Improvement Council to provide a forum to discuss the use of eMaryland Marketplace and compliance with certain provisions of law; and requiring the Council to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 22, 2022 regarding guidelines on how to identify entities required to publish procurement information on the eMaryland Marketplace, how to identify entities that do not comply with the requirement to publish on the eMaryland Marketplace, and recommendations on enforcement mechanisms.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Duties and Report on eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Publications
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Procurement
Publications
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |