MD HB137 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering in Charles County fees for specified holders of alcoholic beverages licenses; altering in Charles County a specified annual fee for providing live entertainment or outdoor table service by a holder of a Class D beer license, Class H beer and light wine license, Class D beer and light wine license, Class C beer, wine and liquor license, and Class D beer, wine and liquor license; etc.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {143994/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Churches
Fees
Hospitals
Hotels and Motels
Nonprofit Organizations
Restaurants
Veterans
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Charles County
Churches
Fees
Hospitals
Hotels and Motels
Nonprofit Organizations
Restaurants
Veterans