MD HB136 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of On-Site Wastewater Professionals in the Department of the Environment to regulate individuals who perform on-site wastewater services in the State and to establish minimum standards for certain on-site waste water systems; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Board, to set by regulation certain fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses and other services provided by the Board; establishing the On-Site Wastewater Professionals Fund; etc.
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-41) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {440410/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB136 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contractors
Counties
Debt Collection
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Gifts
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Time
Treasurers
Water
Wells
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contractors
Counties
Debt Collection
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Gifts
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Licenses
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Time
Treasurers
Water
Wells
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9-11A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |