MD HB1353 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Special Secretary of Minority Affairs, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation and the Attorney General, to establish guidelines for units of State government to consider when determining the appropriate minority business enterprise participation percentage goal for specified procurements; etc.
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Participation and Goals and Subgoals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 201 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {646687/2 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-11 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Minorities
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Commerce and Business
Minorities
Procurement
Public Officials
Public Works, Board of
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Transportation, Department of