MD HB1349 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to require any additional information from a pharmacy benefits manager that may be reasonably necessary to verify information in a certain application; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to establish a certain process by which a certain pharmacy has access to certain maximum allowable cost price lists in an electronic format; applying the Act to all contracts between a pharmacy benefits manager and a pharmacy entered into or in effect on or after January 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451 |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587573/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {396081/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Beneficiaries
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Fees
Fines
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Beneficiaries
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Fees
Fines
Hearings
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Records
Reimbursement Rates