MD HB1349 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product that is labeled as biodegradable, degradable, or decomposable on or after October 1, 2018, subject to a specified exception; prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product labeled as compostable or home compostable on or after October 1, 2018, unless the plastic product meets specified standards; establishing specified penalties; providing for the disposition of specified penalties collected under the Act; etc.
Title
Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-8) (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-8) (Y: 120 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-8) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {830918/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |