MD HB1343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain restriction on an establishment for which a stadium beer, wine, and liquor license may be issued in Harford County; repealing a certain restriction on a stadium beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County that allows an individual to serve liquor during a baseball game only in certain areas of the stadium; and repealing a certain restriction prohibiting a license holder from allowing a roving vendor to dispense beer in the stadium.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-1) (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-1) (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (((44-0))) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-1) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643693/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Sports and Recreation
Stadiums
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Sports and Recreation
Stadiums