MD HB1342 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a purchaser in a foreclosure sale executing a judgment awarding possession of residential property and a landlord executing a warrant of restitution of residential property to store personal property remaining on the residential property for 30 days in a specified manner; providing that the purchaser and landlord are liable to the former occupant or tenant for damage to or loss of the personal property during the storage period; requiring the purchaser and landlord to prepare a specified inventory at a specified time; etc.
Title
Real Property - Storage of Personal Property After Eviction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-28 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Disclosure
Eviction
Foreclosure
Landlord and Tenant
Law Enforcement
Liability
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Notices
Personal Property
Real Property
Records
Sheriffs
Storage
Eviction
Foreclosure
Landlord and Tenant
Law Enforcement
Liability
Liens
Local Government Mandates
Mortgages
Notices
Personal Property
Real Property
Records
Sheriffs
Storage
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1342.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1342f.pdf |