MD HB134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring specified responsibilities relating to the Interagency Council on Homelessness and the Homeless Women - Crisis Shelter Home Program from the Department of Human Resources to the Department of Housing and Community Development; providing for the transfer of the functions, powers, and duties of the Bureau of Homeless Services; requiring the Council to appoint a specified transition team; etc.
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Forms
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Records
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
State Employees
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Forms
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Human Resources, Department of
Indigent Persons
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Records
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
State Employees
Sunset
Women
Work, Labor and Employment