MD HB134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Charles County or a municipal corporation in Charles County to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property that is leased by a new or expanding business that creates 10 or more full-time jobs in an industry targeted for expansion by the Charles County Economic Development Commission.
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - New or Expanding Businesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70 |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Charles County
Commerce and Business
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Leases and Rent
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Work, Labor and Employment