MD HB1339 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a specified person may not set or fish any gill net used in the Chesapeake Bay and its tributaries that has a stretched mesh size exceeding 7 inches.
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {520218/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |