MD HB1337 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a nonresident distillery permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue the permit to specified persons who produce not more than 100,000 gallons of liquor annually; authorizing a holder of a Class 1 distillery license to apply for and obtain a specified wholesaler's license; establishing the Class 8 liquor wholesaler's license; authorizing the issuance of the Class 8 wholesaler's license to specified persons; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Fees
Licenses
Montgomery County
Nonresidents
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Fees
Licenses
Montgomery County
Nonresidents
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures