MD HB1336 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission to study and make findings and recommendations relating to the funding, governance, and performance of mass transit in the greater Baltimore region; and requiring the Commission to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an interim report of its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022, and a final report by December 1, 2023.
Title
Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-19) |
2022-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {343921/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
Committees and Commissions
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation - Generally