MD HB1333 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement that the Department of the Environment pay a homeowner for specified costs associated with the installation of on- site sewage disposal systems utilizing nitrogen removal technology; requiring specified costs paid to a homeowner to be based on the annual household income of the homeowner; etc.
Title
Environment - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Payment of Cost Differential
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-07 | Hearing 4/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (125-1) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |