MD HB1321 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an individual to notify the local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency if the individual has reason to believe that a verbal threat of imminent severe bodily harm or death to a child has been made by a specified individual and that the child is at substantial risk of child abuse; designating specified procedures and requirements for a report concerning a specified verbal threat of harm to a child; etc.
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-6) (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-6) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172111/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Disclosure
Family Law
Good Samaritan
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Threats
Disclosure
Family Law
Good Samaritan
Human Resources, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Threats