MD HB1319 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to proclaim annually the second week in June as Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and environmental organizations, including the Chesapeake Bay Foundation, the Alliance for the Chesapeake Bay, the Choose Clean Water Coalition, and the Chesapeake Bay Commercial Fishermen's Association, to properly observe Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week with specified events, activities, and programs.
Title
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {386885/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Associations
Chesapeake Bay
Fish and Fishing
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Water
Chesapeake Bay
Fish and Fishing
Governor
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Water