MD HB1319 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Class BWL-MZ license for use at a zoo in Druid Hill Park in Baltimore City; specifying that the license may be used to sell beer, wine, and liquor for consumption only on the land and in the facilities used by the zoo; requiring an applicant who has another alcoholic beverages license to exchange that license for a Class BWL- MZ license; authorizing the licensee to designate an agent for a specified purpose; authorizing the sale of beer, wine, and liquor at multiple locations under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Zoo License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-24 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Animals
Baltimore City
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Animals
Baltimore City
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Rules and Regulations