MD HB1310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, rather than requiring, the Department of Natural Resources to revoke a person's authorization to catch oysters if the Department finds or concludes that the person has knowingly committed one of certain offenses; and authorizing a person whose authorization to catch oysters is revoked under certain provisions of law to apply for reinstatement of the authorization after 5 years.
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Revocation
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] |
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1153 (Carry Over) 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 1210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1310?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1310f.pdf |