MD HB131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $2,500 to $5,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for contributions made by certain individuals whose federal adjusted gross income does not exceed $225,000 or, in the case of a married individual filing a separate return, $150,000 to certain college savings plan accounts; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plan Accounts - Contributions (College Savings Tax Enhancement Act)
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2018-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |