MD HB131 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a contract or a proposed contract for the sale or lease of consumer goods or services from including a provision waiving the consumer's right to make a specified statement; prohibiting a person from threatening or seeking enforcement of a specified contract provision; prohibiting a person from penalizing a consumer for making a specified statement; providing that the Act does not limit a person from including in a specified contract a provision prohibiting a consumer from making specified disclosures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96
2016-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2016-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2016-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-22SenateFirst Reading Finance
2016-02-19HouseThird Reading Passed (132-7)
2016-02-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-17HouseFloor Committee Amendment {403093/1 Adopted
2016-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {153193/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2016-02-03HouseHearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
2016-01-22HouseHearing cancelled
2016-02-03HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0131&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0131f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0131t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_96_hb0131t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0131_15319301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0131_40309301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0131.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0131_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0131_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0131,h-0100&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0131,s-0934&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback