MD HB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a petition for expungement of a criminal charge that has been transferred to the juvenile court to be filed in the court of original jurisdiction from which the order of transfer was entered.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for Expungement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69 |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Petitions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Petitions