MD HB131 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-11)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a retail pet store that sells dogs to post conspicuously on each dog's cage specified information about the dog; requiring a retail pet store to maintain a written record that contains specified information about each dog in the possession of the retail pet store; requiring a retail pet store to maintain a record for at least 1 year after the date of sale of a dog and to make specified records available to the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Sales of Dogs - Required Records, Health Disclosures, and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 387876/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-20 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (131-7) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (130-4) | |
2012-02-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-15 | Favorable with Amendments 963590/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-23 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Animals
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Diseases
Examinations
Fees
Health
Labeling
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Unfair Trade Practices
Veterinarians
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Death
Disclosure
Diseases
Examinations
Fees
Health
Labeling
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Registration
Unfair Trade Practices
Veterinarians