MD HB131 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2022, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2021; and requiring the Board, in conjunction with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to make a specified report on or before October 1, 2011.
Title
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-18 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Licenses
Physical Therapists
Privacy
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Licenses
Physical Therapists
Privacy
Reports
Sunset