MD HB1309 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a riparian property owner or lessee shall have the right of first refusal to apply for and, if approved, obtain a water column lease, or an aquaculture lease for use in the water column in an Aquaculture Enterprise Zone, in an area that fronts the riparian property, subject to certain standards and requirements; establishing that the requirement for active use of a lease does not apply to a riparian leaseholder who obtains a water column lease through a right of first refusal; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-22HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback