MD HB1306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a county or municipality may establish specified penalties for failure to comply with a franchise agreement for a cable television system; requiring that a franchise agreement include a service connection requirement for wired broadband service, subject to specified conditions; providing that a specified failure to install wired broadband on request under a service connection requirement of a franchise agreement constitutes a specified breach; etc.
Title
Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Sponsors
Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] |
Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-3) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Cable Television
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Counties
Electronic Communication
Franchises
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Counties
Electronic Communication
Franchises
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Utility Regulation